EP0609774 - Printed circuit board or card for direct chip attachment and fabrication thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alpaugh, Warren A. 883 Rt. 369 Chenango Forks, NY 13746 / US | 02 /
Markovich, Voya R. 3611 Joel Dr. Endwell, NY 13760 / US | 03 /
Trivedi, Ajit K. 4 Newberry Dr. Endicott, NY 13760 / US | 04 /
Zarr, Richard S. 3 Bowen lane Apalachin, NY 13732 / US | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Rach, Werner, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Rach, Werner, Dr., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/32] | Harrison, Robert John IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101191.8 | 27.01.1994 | [1994/32] | Priority number, date | US19930012111 | 01.02.1993 Original published format: US 12111 | [1994/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609774 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609774 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/46, H01L23/538 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
H05K1/112 (EP,US);
H01L23/50 (EP,US);
H01L23/5383 (EP,US);
H01L23/5384 (EP,US);
H01L23/5385 (EP,US);
H05K3/4602 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01046 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01087 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15173 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09472 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09509 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09518 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09536 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10674 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0207 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1394 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1581 (EP,US);
H05K3/0023 (EP,US);
H05K3/0044 (EP,US);
H05K3/0047 (EP,US);
H05K3/0094 (EP,US);
H05K3/4644 (EP,US);
H05K3/4652 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49126 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49144 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49165 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/32] | Title | German: | Gedruckte Schaltungsplatte oder Schaltungskarte zur direkten Befestigung von Chips und ihre Herstellung | [1994/32] | English: | Printed circuit board or card for direct chip attachment and fabrication thereof | [1994/32] | French: | Plaquette ou carte à circuit imprimé pour le montage direct de puces et sa fabrication | [1997/15] |
Former [1994/32] | Panneau ou carte à circuit imprimé pour l'attachement direct de puces et sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 19.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/07] | 03.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.04.1997 | [2002/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0373356 (IBM [US]) | [A] - Y. TSUKADA ET AL., "Surface laminar circuit packaging", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 42ND ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 18-20 MAY 1992, SAN DIEGO, CA, US;, IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1992), doi:doi:10.1109/ECTC.1992.204177, pages 22 - 27, XP000473962 [A] 1,3,4,6,7,9,10 * page 24 - page 25 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECTC.1992.204177 | [A] - E. TSUNASHIMA ET AL., "A multilevel epoxy substrate for flip-chip hybrid multichip module applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS,HYBRIDS,AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK US, (199202), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 103 - 106, XP000291751 [A] 1,3,4 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/33.124198 |