EP0609784 - Foldable packaging container and blank therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/32] | Foldable packaging container | ||
[1997/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meurer Druck & Carton GmbH Libellenweg 10 D-78315 Radolfzell / DE | [1994/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Engelbert Ratoldusstrasse 8 D-78315 Radolfzell / DE | 02 /
Höpp, Clemens Konstanzerstrasse 27 D-78315 Radolfzell / DE | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Hiebsch, Gerhard F. Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hiebsch, Gerhard F. Hiebsch Behrmann Nüsse Patentanwälte Postfach 464 78204 Singen / DE | ||
Former [1994/32] | Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing. Hiebsch & Peege Patentanwälte Postfach 464 D-78204 Singen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101252.8 | 28.01.1994 | [1994/32] | Priority number, date | DE19934303041 | 03.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4303041 | [1994/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609784 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609784 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/42, B65D5/42, B65D5/28 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
B65D75/42 (EP,US);
B65D5/2047 (EP,US);
B65D5/28 (EP,US);
B65D5/4208 (EP,US);
B65D5/48022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/46] |
Former [1994/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Faltbarer Verpackungsbehälter und Zuschnitt dafür | [1997/35] | English: | Foldable packaging container and blank therefor | [1997/35] | French: | Caisse de conditionnement repliable et flan pour une telle caisse | [1997/35] |
Former [1994/32] | Faltbarer Verpackungsbehälter | ||
Former [1994/32] | Foldable packaging container | ||
Former [1994/32] | Caisse de conditionnement repliable | Examination procedure | 01.03.1994 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR, LU, MC, PT | 27.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 13.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.04.1994 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.1994 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.1994 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.1994 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 27.08.1997 | ES | 27.08.1997 | FR | 27.08.1997 | IT | 27.08.1997 | SE | 27.11.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/26] | DK | 27.08.1997 | |
ES | 27.08.1997 | ||
IT | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 27.08.1997 | |
IE | 27.08.1997 | ||
IT | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/16] | DK | 27.08.1997 | |
IE | 27.08.1997 | ||
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | DK | 27.08.1997 | |
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
FR | 23.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | DK | 27.08.1997 | |
SE | 27.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | SE | 27.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1425335 (JONATHAN PETERSON) [A] 9 * figure - *; | [A]GB732014 (LEONILDO ETTORE ROLLINI) [A] 15* the whole document *; | [XAY]DE1179449 (FRITZ REINHARDT) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,12-14 * the whole document * [A] 8,15 [Y] 3,10,11; | [YA]FR1511072 (GILLAIN) [Y] 10,11 * the whole document * [A] 1,3; | [A]US4265390 (FALLER RUDOLPH A, et al) [A] 7,13 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4458838 (LACASA JAIME [US], et al) [A] 8 * figure 2 *; | [A]FR2610300 (VIENNOISERIE FINE [FR]) [A] 10 * figure - *; | [AY]EP0303500 (MINIPACK SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 6; figure - * [Y] 3 |