EP0665634 - Circuit arrangement with a field effect transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedl, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Prof.-Messerschmitt-Strasse 38 D-86159 Augsburg / DE | [1995/31] | Application number, filing date | 94101400.3 | 31.01.1994 | [1995/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0665634 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0665634 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/217 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
H02M7/217 (EP);
H02M3/33592 (EP);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [1995/40] |
Former [1995/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung mit einem Feldeffekttransistor | [1995/31] | English: | Circuit arrangement with a field effect transistor | [1995/31] | French: | Circuit avec un transistor à effet de champ | [1995/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC | 06.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 19.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.03.1995 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.1995 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8501161 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]WO8905058 (MAGELLAN CORP AUSTRALIA [AU]) [A] 1-5 * page 11, line 1 - line 32; figure 8 *; | [A]EP0529180 (ALCATEL BELL SDT SA [BE]) [A] 1,2* figure 2 * | Examination | DE3429572 |