EP0616401 - Busbar package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knoop, Franz-Josef Sonnenhang 7 D-33142 Büren-Steinhausen / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Heinrich Pfarrer-Kunders-Strasse 9 D-33129 Delbrück-Boke / DE | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Epping, Wilhelm, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/38] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101574.5 | 02.02.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | DE19930003886U | 16.03.1993 Original published format: DE 9303886 U | [1994/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0616401 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0616401 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/20, H01B7/08 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
H02G5/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/38] | Title | German: | Stromschienenpaket | [1994/38] | English: | Busbar package | [1994/38] | French: | Pile de barres omnibus | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/07] | 25.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.07.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.07.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0050547 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [Y] 1,4-7; | [Y]DE1465167 (BBC) [Y] 1,4-7 |