EP0609880 - Cube-corner retroreflector with pigment particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coderre, James C., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manuf.Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101646.1 | 03.02.1994 | [1994/32] | Priority number, date | US19930014334 | 05.02.1993 Original published format: US 14334 | [1994/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609880 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609880 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/124 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
G02B5/124 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/1405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/32] | Title | German: | Würfelecken-Retroreflektor mit Farbpartikeln | [1994/32] | English: | Cube-corner retroreflector with pigment particles | [1994/32] | French: | Rétroréflecteur du type en sommet de cube avec des particules de pigment | [1994/32] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 10.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2000 | ES | 09.08.2000 | IT | 09.08.2000 | SE | 09.11.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
ES | 09.08.2000 | ||
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 09.08.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3684348 (ROWLAND WILLIAM P) [AD] 1,3 * column 8, line 32 - line 47; figure 3 *; | [A]US4123140 (RYAN JOHN R, et al) [A] 1,2,7,10 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 2; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0225123 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,2,10 * page 7, line 16 - line 21; figure 1A *; | [X]FR2662819 (REFLEXITE CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,10 * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 7 * * page 15, line 17 - line 25; figure 3 *; | [AD]EP0489561 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [AD] 1,9* abstract *; | [XP]WO9314422 (STIMSONITE CORP [US]) [XP] 1,2,10 * page 9, line 19 - line 33; figure 4 * |