EP0615771 - Apparatus for operating a fire extinguishing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL WALTHER GmbH, Feuerschutz und Sicherheit Waltherstrasse 51 51069 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states TOTAL WALTHER GmbH, Feuerschutz und Sicherheit Waltherstrasse 51 51069 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states Total Walther Feuerschutz GmbH Waltherstrasse 51 D-51069 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klingberg, Peter Nobelstrasse 13 D-51107 Köln / DE | 02 /
Kötter, Karl Entgesbüchel 10 D-51503 Rösrath / DE | 03 /
Schaefers, Herbert Klee Strasse 5 D-51491 Overath / DE | 04 /
Schmidt, Werner Concordiastrasse 45 D-50374 Erftstadt / DE | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101685.9 | 04.02.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | DE19934304257 | 12.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4304257 | [1994/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615771 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0615771 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A62C39/00, A62C35/02 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
F16K1/305 (EP);
A62C35/13 (EP);
A62C35/68 (EP);
A62C37/44 (EP);
A62C99/0018 (EP);
F16K1/306 (EP);
F16K31/122 (EP);
F17C13/04 (EP);
F17C2205/0146 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Betreiben einer Feuerlöscheinrichtung | [1994/38] | English: | Apparatus for operating a fire extinguishing system | [1994/38] | French: | Dispositif de fonctionnement d'un système d'extinction d'incendies | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.11.1999 | SE | 17.11.1999 | [2002/26] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 17.11.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1330001 (J.ROUVET) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0010465 (CERBERUS GUINARD [FR])[A] 1,14; | [A]FR2646783 (TOTAL FEUERSCHUTZ GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0409237 (HEKATRON GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 |