EP0610834 - Mounting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Langer geb. Layher, Ruth Im Weinberg 38 D-74363 Güglingen / DE | [1994/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Utermann, Gerd Kilianstrasse 7 (Kilianspassage) 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Utermann, Gerd, Dipl.-Ing. Kilianstrasse 7 (Kilianspassage) D-74072 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101751.9 | 05.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | DE19934303631 | 09.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4303631 | [1994/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610834 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610834 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B25F1/00 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
B25B13/461 (EP);
B25B13/00 (EP);
B25F1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/33] | Title | German: | Montagewerkzeug | [1994/33] | English: | Mounting tool | [1994/33] | French: | Outil de montage | [1994/33] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 14.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 08.01.1997 | ES | 08.01.1997 | FR | 08.01.1997 | GB | 08.01.1997 | IT | 08.01.1997 | NL | 08.01.1997 | AT | 05.02.1997 | BE | 28.02.1997 | CH | 28.02.1997 | LI | 28.02.1997 | LU | 28.02.1997 | PT | 08.04.1997 | SE | 08.04.1997 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/08] | DK | 08.01.1997 | |
ES | 08.01.1997 | ||
GB | 08.01.1997 | ||
IT | 08.01.1997 | ||
NL | 08.01.1997 | ||
AT | 05.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
LU | 28.02.1997 | ||
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
FR | 06.06.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | DK | 08.01.1997 | |
ES | 08.01.1997 | ||
GB | 08.01.1997 | ||
IT | 08.01.1997 | ||
AT | 05.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
LU | 28.02.1997 | ||
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
FR | 06.06.1997 | ||
Former [2000/07] | DK | 08.01.1997 | |
GB | 08.01.1997 | ||
IT | 08.01.1997 | ||
AT | 05.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
LU | 28.02.1997 | ||
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
FR | 06.06.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 08.01.1997 | |
GB | 08.01.1997 | ||
IT | 08.01.1997 | ||
AT | 05.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
FR | 06.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | DK | 08.01.1997 | |
GB | 08.01.1997 | ||
AT | 05.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
FR | 06.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | BE | 08.01.1997 | |
DK | 08.01.1997 | ||
GB | 08.01.1997 | ||
AT | 05.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
FR | 06.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 08.01.1997 | |
DK | 08.01.1997 | ||
GB | 08.01.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
FR | 06.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | BE | 08.01.1997 | |
GB | 08.01.1997 | ||
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
SE | 08.04.1997 | ||
FR | 06.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | BE | 08.01.1997 | |
GB | 08.01.1997 | ||
PT | 08.04.1997 | ||
FR | 06.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | BE | 08.01.1997 | |
GB | 08.01.1997 | ||
FR | 06.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/44] | GB | 08.01.1997 | |
FR | 06.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | GB | 08.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE1723997U (MANNESMANN AG) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE2639988 (ZIMMERMANN HEINZ) [DA] 1* claim 1 * |