EP0667625 - Electrostatic coated polyamide material, its use and process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/33] | Electrostatic coatable polyamide material, its use and process for its preparation | ||
[1997/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.A. Rueb Holding GmbH Oberfeldstrasse 1-5 79677 Schönau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states F.A. Rueb Holding GmbH Oberfeldstrasse 1-5 79677 Schönau / DE | ||
Former [1997/29] | For all designated states Frisetta Polymer GmbH & Co. KG Oberfeld 1 - 5 79677 Schönau/Schwarzwald / DE | ||
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states FRISETTA GmbH Kunststoffwerke, Oberfeld 1 - 5 D-79677 Schönau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baquè, Thomas Ledergasse 12 D-79677 Schönau i. Schw. / DE | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101964.8 | 09.02.1994 | [1995/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667625 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667625 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/22, H01B1/24, C08K3/08, C08K7/06, // (C08K7/06, 3:08) | [1995/33] | CPC: |
H01B1/24 (EP);
C08K3/08 (EP);
C08K7/06 (EP);
H01B1/22 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/08, C08L77/00 (EP);
C08K7/06, C08L77/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/33] | Title | German: | Elektrostatisch beschichter Polyamidwerkstoff, Verwendung und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1997/30] | English: | Electrostatic coated polyamide material, its use and process for its preparation | [1997/30] | French: | Matériau en polyamide électrostatique revêtu, son utilisation et méthode pour sa préparation | [1997/30] |
Former [1995/33] | Elektrostatisch beschichtbarer Polyamidwerkstoff, Verwendung und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | ||
Former [1995/33] | Electrostatic coatable polyamide material, its use and process for its preparation | ||
Former [1995/33] | Matériau en polyamide électrostatique revêtable, son utilisation et méthode pour sa préparation | Examination procedure | 13.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/33] | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS60245668 ; | [Y]JPS61151283 ; | [Y]JPS62131033 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860506), vol. 010, no. 120, Database accession no. (C - 343), & JP60245668 A 19851205 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861126), vol. 010, no. 350, Database accession no. (C - 387), & JP61151283 A 19860709 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871125), vol. 011, no. 361, Database accession no. (C - 459), & JP62131033 A 19870613 (ASAHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * |