EP0611749 - Substituted amic acid derivatives useful for treatment of arteriosclerosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 2-3, Nihonbashi Honcho 2-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nomoto, Takashi, c/o Banyu Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-33 / JP | 02 /
Masahiro, Hayashi, c/o Banyu Pharm. Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-33 / JP | 03 /
Shibata, Jun, c/o Banyu Pharm. Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-33 / JP | 04 /
Iwasawa, Yoshikazu, c/o Banyu Pharm. Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-33 / JP | 05 /
Mitsuya, Morihiro, c/o Banyu Pharm. Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-33 / JP | 06 /
Iida, Yoshiaki, c/o Banyu Pharm. Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-33 / JP | 07 /
Nonoshita, Katsumasa, c/o Banyu Pharm. Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-33 / JP | 08 /
Nagata, Yasufumi, c/o Banyu Pharm. Co., Ltd. Tsukuba Research Institute, 3, Okubo Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken, 300-33 / JP | [1994/34] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102059.6 | 10.02.1994 | [1994/34] | Priority number, date | JP19930047364 | 12.02.1993 Original published format: JP 4736493 | JP19930261713 | 24.09.1993 Original published format: JP 26171393 | JP19930261714 | 24.09.1993 Original published format: JP 26171493 | [1994/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611749 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611749 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C233/05, C07C233/13, C07C233/18, C07C211/27, C07C211/29, C07C69/34, A61K31/16 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
C07D213/40 (EP,US);
C07C211/27 (EP,US);
C07C211/29 (EP,US);
C07C215/52 (EP,US);
C07C217/60 (EP,US);
C07C233/05 (EP,US);
C07C233/13 (EP,US);
C07C233/18 (EP,US);
C07C235/06 (EP,US);
C07C69/34 (EP,US);
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C07D215/12 (EP,US);
C07D215/48 (EP,US);
C07D263/32 (EP,US);
C07D307/14 (EP,US);
C07D307/52 (EP,US);
C07D307/81 (EP,US);
C07D317/58 (EP,US);
C07D333/20 (EP,US);
C07D333/28 (EP,US);
C07D333/54 (EP,US);
C07D333/58 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/34] | Title | German: | Substituierte Aminsäure Derivate verwendbar für die Behandlung von Arteriosclerosis | [1994/34] | English: | Substituted amic acid derivatives useful for treatment of arteriosclerosis | [1994/34] | French: | Acides amiques substitués utilisables pour le traitement d'artiosclérosis | [1994/34] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 08.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.10.1997 | BE | 22.10.1997 | CH | 22.10.1997 | DK | 22.10.1997 | ES | 22.10.1997 | GR | 22.10.1997 | LI | 22.10.1997 | NL | 22.10.1997 | PT | 22.01.1998 | SE | 22.01.1998 | IE | 10.02.1998 | LU | 10.02.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
CH | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
ES | 22.10.1997 | ||
GR | 22.10.1997 | ||
LI | 22.10.1997 | ||
NL | 22.10.1997 | ||
PT | 22.01.1998 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
IE | 10.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
CH | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
ES | 22.10.1997 | ||
GR | 22.10.1997 | ||
LI | 22.10.1997 | ||
PT | 22.01.1998 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
IE | 10.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
CH | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
GR | 22.10.1997 | ||
LI | 22.10.1997 | ||
PT | 22.01.1998 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
IE | 10.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
CH | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
GR | 22.10.1997 | ||
LI | 22.10.1997 | ||
PT | 22.01.1998 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
GR | 22.10.1997 | ||
PT | 22.01.1998 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
CH | 27.01.1998 | ||
LI | 27.01.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
GR | 22.10.1997 | ||
PT | 22.01.1998 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
PT | 22.01.1998 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
PT | 22.01.1998 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/21] | SE | 22.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1103936 (HOECHST AG) [A] 19 * example -; claim - *; | [A]GB1014889 (MERCK & CO INC) [A] 1-18,21,22 * page 1, line 29 - line 38; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0339878 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [X] 19 * claim - *; | [DA]WO9215579 (RHONE POULENC RORER INT [US]) [DA] 1-18,21,22* example -; claim - * | [X] - KVITTINGEN, L. ET. AL., "Highly regioselective enzymic hydrolysis of tricarballylates ("retro-fats") and citrates by subtilisin.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910513), vol. 114, no. 19, Database accession no. 185120c, page 752, column 2 [X] 20 * abstract * | [ ] - BIOTECHNOL. LETT., (1991), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 13 - 18 | [DA] - SCHULTZ, E.M. ET. AL., "Maleamic acids that affect plasma cholesterol and penicillin excretion.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (196707), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 717 - 24 [DA] 1-18,21,22 * whole document * |