EP0611938 - Kiln firing support for ceramic articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Thomas Metall- und Elektrowerke Hellerstrasse 6 57290 Neunkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states Robert Thomas Metall- und Elektrowerke Hellerstrasse 6 D-57290 Neunkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernhardt, Thomas Königsberger Str. 12 D-57290 Neunkirchen / DE | [1994/34] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Dietrich, et al Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-VALENTIN-GIHSKE Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | Grosse, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-VALENTIN-GIHSKE Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102092.7 | 10.02.1994 | [1994/34] | Priority number, date | DE19934303724 | 10.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4303724 | [1994/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611938 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/00, C22C19/05, C22C38/18, F27D5/00 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
C22C19/058 (EP);
C04B33/32 (EP);
C22C19/053 (EP);
C22C19/055 (EP);
F27D3/12 (EP);
F27D2003/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1994/49] |
Former [1994/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Brenngutträger für keramische Formlinge | [1994/34] | English: | Kiln firing support for ceramic articles | [1994/34] | French: | Râtelier de caisson pour articles de poterie | [1994/34] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 11.03.1994 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, DK, ES, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.04.1994 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.1994 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.1994 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.1994 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.1994 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.1994 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.1994 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.1994 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.1994 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.1994 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.04.1994 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1196656 (KERAMISCHE IND BEDARFS K G PAU) [X] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1501970 (ENTPR S DE LA NIED SOC ET) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0091526 (ALLEGHENY LUDLUM STEEL [US]) [A] 3 *Patentansprüche 1-11*; | [A]DE8802597U (DANNENBERGER VORRICHTUNGSBAU -DAVO- STELLAMANNS) [A] 3,5-18; | [A]DE3011114 (KLEFISCH RUDOLF) [A] 3,5-18 * the whole document * | [X] - J. FRICK, Woldman's ENGINEERING ALLOYS, MATERIALS PARK, OHIO, US, ASM INTERNATIONAL, (1990) [X] 1,2 *Seite 645, linke Spalte: INCONEL ALLOY 601* | [X] - J.FRICK, Woldman's ENGINEERING ALLOYS, MATERIALS PARK, OHIO, US, ASM INTERNATIONAL, (1990) [X] 3 *Seite 685, linke Spalte und mittlere Spalte: KANTHAL A,..A-1,..DR,..DSD,..SUPER,..-DL* | [X] - C.W.WEGST, STAHLSCHLÜSSEL, 15.Auflage, MARBACH, VERLAG STAHLSCHLÜSSEL WEGST GMBH, (1989) [X] 3 *Seiten 267 und 270, Stoff-Nr. 1.4765 und 1.4767* | by applicant | DE1265019 |