EP0612678 - Mobile inclined ramp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alten, Kurt Ringstrasse 14 D-30974 Wennigsen / DE | [1994/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Depmeyer, Lothar Auf der Höchte 30 30823 Garbsen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Depmeyer, Lothar Auf der Höchte 30 D-30823 Garbsen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102110.7 | 11.02.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | DE19930002594U | 23.02.1993 Original published format: DE 9302594 U | [1994/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0612678 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0612678 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65G69/28, B62D53/08, B60D1/66 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
B65G69/30 (EP);
B60D1/36 (EP);
E04G27/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/35] | Title | German: | Fahrbare Schrägrampe | [1994/35] | English: | Mobile inclined ramp | [1994/35] | French: | Rampe inclinée mobile | [1994/35] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 21.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 03.07.1996 | ES | 03.07.1996 | FR | 03.07.1996 | GB | 03.07.1996 | IT | 03.07.1996 | NL | 03.07.1996 | PT | 03.10.1996 | SE | 03.10.1996 | AT | 11.02.1997 | BE | 28.02.1997 | CH | 28.02.1997 | LI | 28.02.1997 | IE | 06.03.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | DK | 03.07.1996 | |
ES | 03.07.1996 | ||
FR | 03.07.1996 | ||
GB | 03.07.1996 | ||
IT | 03.07.1996 | ||
NL | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
AT | 11.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
IE | 06.03.1997 | ||
Former [2002/32] | DK | 03.07.1996 | |
ES | 03.07.1996 | ||
FR | 03.07.1996 | ||
GB | 03.07.1996 | ||
IT | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
AT | 11.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
IE | 06.03.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | DK | 03.07.1996 | |
ES | 03.07.1996 | ||
GB | 03.07.1996 | ||
IT | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
AT | 11.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
IE | 06.03.1997 | ||
Former [2002/10] | DK | 03.07.1996 | |
GB | 03.07.1996 | ||
IT | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
AT | 11.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
IE | 06.03.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 03.07.1996 | |
GB | 03.07.1996 | ||
IE | 03.07.1996 | ||
IT | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
AT | 11.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1999/16] | DK | 03.07.1996 | |
GB | 03.07.1996 | ||
IE | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
AT | 11.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | DK | 03.07.1996 | |
GB | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
AT | 11.02.1997 | ||
BE | 28.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | BE | 03.07.1996 | |
DK | 03.07.1996 | ||
GB | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
AT | 11.02.1997 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 03.07.1996 | |
DK | 03.07.1996 | ||
GB | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
CH | 28.02.1997 | ||
LI | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/24] | BE | 03.07.1996 | |
GB | 03.07.1996 | ||
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | GB | 03.07.1996 | |
PT | 03.10.1996 | ||
SE | 03.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | GB | 03.07.1996 | |
SE | 03.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE1225560 (RUDI KNIWEL) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 3-6; | [YA]US3863894 (MANSI JOSEPH S, et al) [Y] 3-5 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [YA]EP0216075 (ALTEN K) [Y] 6 * the whole document *[A] 1 |