EP0613187 - High voltage MIS field effect transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujishima, Naoto, c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kitamura, Akio, c/o FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102258.4 | 14.02.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | JP19930025109 | 15.02.1993 Original published format: JP 2510993 | [1994/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0613187 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0613187 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0613187 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/772, H01L29/08, H01L29/06, H01L29/41 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
H01L29/7816 (EP,US);
H01L29/0615 (EP,US);
H01L29/0696 (EP,US);
H01L29/41758 (EP,US);
H01L29/7809 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/50] | H01L29/784, H01L29/08, H01L29/06, H01L29/52 | ||
Former IPC [1994/35] | H01L29/784, H01L29/08, H01L29/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1994/35] | Title | German: | Hochspannung-MIS-Feldeffekttransistor | [1994/35] | English: | High voltage MIS field effect transistor | [1994/35] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ MIS haute-tension | [1994/35] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1999/19: (deleted) | EPB 1999/19: (deleted) | EPB 1999/19: (deleted) | EPB 1997/45: Teilanmeldung 97114091.8 eingereicht am 14/08/97 | EPB 1997/45: Divisional application 97114091.8 filed on 14/08/97 | EPB 1997/45: Demande divisionnaire 97114091.8 déposée le 14/08/97 | Examination procedure | 17.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97114091.8 / EP0810672 | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3816002 (INT RECTIFIER CORP [US]) [Y] 8-10,13-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS5638867 ; | [A]EP0337823 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5055896 (WILLIAMS RICHARD K [US], et al) [A] 1,3,8 * column W *; | [A]JPS5880869 ; | [A]JPS5712558 ; | [A]JPH01207976 ; | [A]JPS62242365 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810620), vol. 5, no. 95, Database accession no. (E - 062), & JP56038867 A 19810414 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 8-10,13-15 * abstract * | [PX] - NAOTO FUJISHIMA ET AL, "Low On-Resistance High-Voltage Power DMOSFET with an Interdigited Form", EXTENDED ABSTRACTS OF THE 1993 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID STATE DEVICES AND MATERIALS, AUGUST 29-SEPTEMBER 1, 1993 CHIBA MAKUHARI MESSE, pages 491 - 493 [PX] 8-10,13,14 * the whole document * | [A] - M. AMATO, "REDUCED ELECTRIC FIELD CROWDING AT THE FINGERTIPS OF LATERAL DMOS TRANSISTORS", EXTENDED ABSTRACTS (1987) SPRING, PHILADEPHIA,PA,USA, vol. 87-1, no. 1 [A] 1,8-10 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830802), vol. 7, no. 174, Database accession no. (E - 190), & JP58080869 A 19830516 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [A] 1,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820507), vol. 6, no. 72, Database accession no. (E - 105), & JP57012558 A 19820122 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891116), vol. 13, no. 513, Database accession no. (E - 847), & JP01207976 A 19890821 (NEC CORP) [A] 16,17,19 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880408), vol. 12, no. 111, Database accession no. (E - 589), & JP62242365 A 19871022 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 16,17,19 * abstract * | [A] - E. J. WILDI ET AL, "MODELING AND PROCESS IMPLEMENTATION OF IMPLANTED RESURF TYPE DEVICES", TECHNICAL DIGEST OF THE INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING 1982, SAN FRANCISCO, CA DECEMBER 13-14-15, pages 268 - 271 [A] 18 * page 270, column 1; figure 3 * |