EP0616369 - MIS-type semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/38] | MOS-type semiconductor device | ||
[1999/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otsuki, Masahito, c/o Fuji Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Ueno, Katsunori, c/o Fuji Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102339.2 | 16.02.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | JP19930026440 | 16.02.1993 Original published format: JP 2644093 | [1994/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0616369 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0616369 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/749, H01L29/739, H01L29/745, H01L29/10 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
H01L29/1095 (EP,US);
H01L29/7395 (EP,US);
H01L29/7455 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/38] | H01L29/72, H01L29/10, H01L29/74 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/38] | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement vom MIS-Typ | [1999/21] | English: | MIS-type semiconductor device | [1999/21] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur de type MIS | [1999/21] |
Former [1994/38] | Halbleiterbauelement vom MOS-Typ | ||
Former [1994/38] | MOS-type semiconductor device | ||
Former [1994/38] | Dispositif semi-conducteur de type MOS | Examination procedure | 25.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 22.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 26.05.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/25] | FR | 22.10.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01258473 ; | [A]JPH01238171 ; | [A]JPH0244776 ; | [A]GB2156151 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]DE3823270 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US4821095 (TEMPLE VICTOR A K [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [PY]EP0581246 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X] - J. S. AJIT ET AL., "The Minority Carrier Injection Controlled Field-Effect Transistor (MICFET): A New MOS-Gated Power Transistor Structure", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, NEW YORK US, (199208), vol. 39, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1109/16.144689, pages 1954 - 1960, XP000294805 [X] 1-5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.144689 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900112), vol. 14, no. 16, Database accession no. (E - 872)<3959>, & JP01258473 A 19891016 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891218), vol. 13, no. 571, Database accession no. (E - 862)<3919>, & JP01238171 A 19890922 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900426), vol. 14, no. 205, Database accession no. (E - 9821)<4148>, & JP02044776 A 19900214 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | Examination | EP0219995 |