EP0613231 - Method and circuit arrangement for controlling an output voltage with a predetermined value from a variable input voltage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busch, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Flugfeldstrasse 1 D-86179 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Sterzik, Willi, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Radetzkystrasse 3 D-86165 Augsburg / DE | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102493.7 | 18.02.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | DE19934306071 | 26.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4306071 | [1994/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0613231 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0613231 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/10, H02M3/335 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
H02M3/3378 (EP,US);
H02M3/00 (EP,US);
H02M7/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/35] | H02M3/00, H02M7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zum Einregeln einer Ausgangsspannung vorgegebener Höhe aus einer veränderlichen Eingangsspannung | [1994/35] | English: | Method and circuit arrangement for controlling an output voltage with a predetermined value from a variable input voltage | [1994/35] | French: | Procédé et disposition de circuit pour réguler une tension de sortie à une valeur prédéterminée à partir d'une tension d'entrée variable | [1994/35] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 17.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4443752 (NEWMAN WILLIAM A [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 32 - column 6, line 24 *; | [A]US5134355 (HASTINGS ROY ALAN [US]) [A] 1* column 4, line 12 - column 22, line 24 * |