EP0606110 - Method of enhancing the insecticidal activity of an insecticidal composition containing a coleopteran-toxic protein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOGEN, INC. 2005 Cabot Boulevard West Langhorne, PA 19047-1810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | For all designated states ECOGEN INC 2005 Cabot Boulevard West Langhorne, PA 19047-1810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donovan, William P. 36 Calicobush Road Levittown, Pennsylvania 19057 / US | 02 /
Rupar, Mark J. 42 Sturbridge Drive Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | 03 /
Slaney, Annette C. 4 Dunmoor Court South Hamilton Square, New Jersey 08690 / US | 04 /
Johnson, Timothy B. 142 E. Highland Avenue Langhorne, Pennsylvania 19047 / US | [1994/28] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102819.3 | 18.03.1991 | [1994/28] | Priority number, date | US19900496568 | 20.03.1990 Original published format: US 496568 | [1994/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0606110 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/32, A01N63/00 | [1994/28] | CPC: |
C07K14/325 (EP,KR,US);
A01N63/23 (KR);
A01N63/50 (EP,US);
Y10S530/82 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N63/50, A01N63/23, A01N2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erhöhung der Inzekticid-Wirkung eines Inzekticid-Präparates das ein Coleoptera-toxisches Protein enthält | [1994/28] | English: | Method of enhancing the insecticidal activity of an insecticidal composition containing a coleopteran-toxic protein | [1994/28] | French: | Procédé pour l'augmentation de l'activité insecticide d'une préparation insecticide contenant une protéine toxique pour les coléoptères | [1994/28] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 10.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 08.02.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91907293.4 / EP0522036 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0288829 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,5-10 * page 9; example 6 *; | [A]WO8808880 (ECOGEN INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 8 * * page 20 - page 27 * * page 43, line 12 - line 20 * * claims 62-64,66,69-72 *; | [A]EP0337604 (MYCOGEN CORP [US]) |