EP0625388 - Method for the controlled pre-rolling of thin slabs leaving a continuous casting plant, and relative device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | [2000/28] |
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 I-33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruzza, Wogler Viale Ungheria 63 I-33100 Udine / IT | 02 /
Striuli, Mirco Via Rossini 4 I-30027 San Dona' Di Piave (Venezia) / IT | 03 /
Lavazza, Alfredo Via Ortigara 6 I-21058 Solbiate Olona (Varese) / IT | 04 /
Carboni, Andrea Via Vodice 13 I-20148 Milano / IT | 05 /
Coassin, Giovanni Via del Maglio 4 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 94102876.3 | 25.02.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | IT1993UD00083 | 17.05.1993 Original published format: IT UD930083 | [1994/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625388 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0625388 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/12, B22D11/16, B22D11/06 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
B22D11/0602 (EP);
B22D11/0622 (EP);
B22D11/1206 (EP);
B22D11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1994/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum geregelten Vorwalzen von aus einer Stranggiessanlage austretenden Dünnbrammen | [1999/38] | English: | Method for the controlled pre-rolling of thin slabs leaving a continuous casting plant, and relative device | [1994/47] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le prélaminage de brames minces sortant d'une installation de coulée continue | [1994/47] |
Former [1994/47] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum geregleten Vorwalsen von aus einer Stranggiessanlage austretenden Dünnbrammen | Examination procedure | 26.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 30.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.2001
ADMISSIBLE SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Valentin-Gihske-Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.2001
ADMISSIBLE SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Grosse-Valentin-Gihske ,Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | 21.05.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.09.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.07.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.07.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/04] | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01) | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 25.02.2001 | [2008/29] |
Former [2003/21] | PT | 31.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6030565 ; | [DA]US3891025 (BOLLIG GEORG, et al); | [DA]US4056140 (IVES KENNETH D, et al); | [DA]US4134440 (KAWAWA TAKAHO, et al); | [A]DE3822939 (MANNESMANN AG) [A] 1-34 * claim 4 *; | [A]EP0353402 (THYSSEN STAHL AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,17; | [A]EP0391823 (TECHMETAL PROMOTION [FR]) [A] 7,10,17,21,28,29,32,33; | [DA]EP0539784 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850629), vol. 9, no. 155, Database accession no. (M - 392)<1878>, & JP60030565 A 19850216 (OO SHII SHII K.K.) [A] 1,10 * abstract * |