EP0614311 - IIR ghost cancelling system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [1999/34] |
Former [1994/36] | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dieterich, Charles Benjamin 7 Euclid Avenue Kingston, NJ 08528 / US | [1994/36] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Hartnack, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Licensing & Intellectual Property, Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1994/36] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing. Thomson Consumer Electronics Sales GmbH Postfach 91 13 45 D-30433 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 94102883.9 | 25.02.1994 | [1994/36] | Priority number, date | US19930025496 | 03.03.1993 Original published format: US 25496 | [1994/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0614311 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0614311 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/21, H03H17/04 | [1994/36] | CPC: |
H04N5/211 (EP,US);
H04N5/21 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/36] | Title | German: | System zur Unterdrückung von Geisterbildern unter Verwendung eines Filters mit unendlicher Impulsantwort | [1998/38] | English: | IIR ghost cancelling system | [1994/36] | French: | Système de filtre à réponse impulsionelle infinie pour supprimer les images fantômes | [1994/36] |
Former [1994/36] | Verfahren zur Unterdrückung von Geisterbildern unter Verwendung eines Filters mit unendlicher Impulsantwort | Examination procedure | 09.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 18.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS57185727 ; | [A]JPS59198020 ; | [A]US3609568 (JACKSON LELAND BROOKS) [A] 1,3,4,7* column 1, line 33 - line 73 *; | [YA]WO8907376 (RCA LICENSING CORP [US]) [Y] 1 * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 10 * * page 6, line 10 - line 20; figure 2 * * page 6, line 36 - page 7, line 26 * * page 10, line 3 - line 27; figure 3 * [A] 7; | [D]US4864403 (CHAO TZY-HONG [US], et al); | [A]EP0413460 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,7 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 8 * * page 2, line 19 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0467338 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 13 - line 36 * * column 4, line 20 - column 7, line 35; figures 1-6 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830209), vol. 7, no. 33, Database accession no. (E - 157), & JP57185727 A 19810512 (NIPPON VICTOR K.K.) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 3,7 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850312), vol. 9, no. 56, Database accession no. (E - 302), & JP59198020 A 19841109 (SONY K.K.) [A] 1,3-5,7 * abstract * |