EP0615823 - Process and apparatus for making twin plain tiles and twin roof tiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZIEGELEI HOCHDORF AG Ziegeleihof 20 CH-6280 Hochdorf / CH | [1994/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gmeiner, Markus, Dipl.-Ing. ETH/SIA Rosengartenhalde 20 CH-6006 Luzern / CH | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 94103347.4 | 05.03.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | CH19930000791 | 16.03.1993 Original published format: CH 79193 | [1994/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615823 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0615823 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B28B11/12, B28B11/14 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
B28B11/12 (EP);
B28B11/14 (EP,US);
B28B17/0018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Konfektionieren von Biber-Doppelformlingen und Doppelfalzziegeln | [1994/38] | English: | Process and apparatus for making twin plain tiles and twin roof tiles | [1994/38] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de tuiles plates jumelées et de tuiles doubles | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 18.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.09.1998 | GB | 02.09.1998 | GR | 02.09.1998 | IT | 02.09.1998 | NL | 02.09.1998 | DK | 02.12.1998 | PT | 02.12.1998 | SE | 02.12.1998 | BE | 31.03.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/45] | ES | 02.09.1998 | |
GB | 02.09.1998 | ||
GR | 02.09.1998 | ||
NL | 02.09.1998 | ||
DK | 02.12.1998 | ||
PT | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 02.09.1998 | |
GB | 02.09.1998 | ||
GR | 02.09.1998 | ||
NL | 02.09.1998 | ||
PT | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 02.09.1998 | |
GB | 02.09.1998 | ||
GR | 02.09.1998 | ||
PT | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GB | 02.09.1998 | |
GR | 02.09.1998 | ||
PT | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | GB | 02.09.1998 | |
PT | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | GB | 02.09.1998 | |
PT | 02.12.1998 | ||
SE | 02.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/30] | GB | 02.09.1998 | |
PT | 02.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/29] | PT | 02.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE211263 (FIRMA LEONHARD GNAD) [A] 1,10* the whole document *; | [A]FR383275 (LEONHARD GNAD [DE]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2757190 (LINGL ANLAGENBAU) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0293507 (FUCHS & CO GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2633553 (WOESTELANDT JOSEPH [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9013404 (HOCHDORF ZIEGELEI AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |