EP0624015 - Improvements relating to ATM communication systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROKE MANOR RESEARCH LIMITED Roke Manor Romsey Hampshire, SO51 0ZN / GB | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states ROKE MANOR RESEARCH LIMITED Roke Manor Romsey, Hampshire, SO51 0ZN / GB | ||
For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states ROKE MANOR RESEARCH LIMITED Roke Manor Romsey, Hampshire, SO51 0ZN / GB | ||
For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayter, Timothy Andrew 3 Cobden Gardens Bitterne Park, Southampton S02 4LN / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Wolfgang Erikastrasse 18d D-82110 Germering / DE | 03 /
Davis, Simon Paul 17 Westering Romsey, Hampshire S051 7LX / DE | 04 /
Worster, Thomas Belgrad Strasse 24 D-80796 Munich / DE | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Condon, Neil Siemens AG P.O. Box 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Condon, Neil Siemens AG P.O. Box 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/45] | Allen, Derek Siemens Group Services Limited Intellectual Property Department Roke Manor Old Salisbury Lane Romsey Hampshire SO51 0ZN / GB | Application number, filing date | 94103484.5 | 08.03.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | GB19930009468 | 07.05.1993 Original published format: GB 9309468 | [1994/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0624015 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0624015 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0624015 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04Q11/04 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
H04L49/508 (EP,US);
H04L12/5602 (EP,US);
H04L49/3018 (EP,US);
H04L49/3081 (EP,US);
H04L49/503 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5635 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5651 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5679 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/45] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen in ATM-Nachrichtensystemen | [1994/45] | English: | Improvements relating to ATM communication systems | [1994/45] | French: | Améliorations apportées à des systèmes de communication ATM | [1994/45] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 24.04.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2003 | BE | 14.05.2003 | CH | 14.05.2003 | IT | 14.05.2003 | LI | 14.05.2003 | NL | 14.05.2003 | SE | 14.08.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
BE | 14.05.2003 | ||
CH | 14.05.2003 | ||
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 14.05.2003 | |
CH | 14.05.2003 | ||
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 14.05.2003 | |
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
NL | 14.05.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 14.05.2003 | |
LI | 14.05.2003 | ||
SE | 14.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 14.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - TAMIR Y ET AL, "HIGH-PERFORMANCE MULTI-QUEUE BUFFERS FOR CLSI COMMUNICATION SWITCHES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE. HONOLULU, MAY 30 - JUNE 2, 1988, WASHINGTON, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19880530), vol. SYMP. 15, pages 343 - 354, XP000118245 [A] 1-9 * section II * | [A] - COOPER C A ET AL, "TOWARD A BROADBAND CONGESTION CONTROL STRATEGY", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199005), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 18 - 23, XP000160044 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.56531 |