EP0616189 - Manufacturing method for a projectile fragmentation casing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/38] | Fragmentation casing for a projectile and manufacturing method for such a projectile | ||
[1996/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIEHL GMBH & CO. Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states DIEHL GMBH & CO. Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hampel, Heinrich, Dr. Kalvarienstrasse 18 Moresnet-Chapelle / BE | 02 /
Rentzsch, Max Elsterweg 3 D-91220 Schnaittach / DE | 03 /
Strauss, Hans Anemonenstrasse 9 D-91244 Reichenschwand / DE | 04 /
Rieger, Gerald Freilandstrasse 21 B D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | [1994/38] | Application number, filing date | 94103489.4 | 08.03.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | DE19934308027 | 13.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4308027 | [1994/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0616189 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0616189 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0616189 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/32 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
F42B12/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1994/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Splitterkörpers | [1996/23] | English: | Manufacturing method for a projectile fragmentation casing | [1996/23] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une enveloppe à fragmentation pour projectiles | [1996/23] |
Former [1994/38] | Splitterkörper für Splittergeschosse und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Splitterkörpers | ||
Former [1994/38] | Fragmentation casing for a projectile and manufacturing method for such a projectile | ||
Former [1994/38] | Enveloppe à fragmentation pour projectiles et procédé de fabrication d'une telle enveloppe | Examination procedure | 28.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 24.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2129196 (DIEHL FA) [Y] 1-5 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 * * page 4, paragraphs 2-3 *; | [DY]DE3835808 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1-5 * column 2, line 3 - line 21; figure 1 *; | [DY]DE2852657 (DIEHL GMBH & CO) [DY] 2 * page 7, paragraph 6; figure 2 * * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [YA]DE2460013 (KREBSOEGE GMBH SINTERMETALL) [Y] 3 * page 3, paragraphs 1-2; figures 1,2 * * page 5, paragraphs 2-3 * [A] 8; | [X]DE2557676 (DIEHL FA) [X] 1,5 * page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 4; figures 1-6 *; | [X]DE2353204 (DIEHL FA) [X] 1 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,4 * |