EP0617205 - Nail with enlarged section [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 72178 Waldachtal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG Weinhalde 14-18 D-72178 Waldachtal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Artur, Prof. Dr. h. c. Weinhalde 34 D-72178 Waldachtal / DE | [1994/39] | Application number, filing date | 94103505.7 | 08.03.1994 | [1994/39] | Priority number, date | DE19934309047 | 20.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4309047 | [1994/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0617205 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0617205 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0617205 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16B15/00, F16B19/00 | [1996/27] | CPC: |
F16B15/00 (EP);
F16B19/002 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/39] | F16B15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/39] | Title | German: | Nagel mit einem Spreizbereich | [1994/39] | English: | Nail with enlarged section | [1994/39] | French: | Clou avec région élargie | [1994/39] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 09.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 04.02.1999 | [2003/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0149052 (FISCHER ARTUR FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column A * * page 1, line 18 - line 27 * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 19 * * claims 1,2 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0145886 (FISCHER ARTUR FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 17 * * page 3, line 12 - line 25 * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 6 * * claims 1-3 * * figures 1,4 *; | [DA]DE3345331 (FISCHER ARTUR DR H C [DE]); | [A]GB580272 (HAIM DANIEL TABAKMAN, et al) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 8 - line 13 * * page 1, line 30 - line 47 * * claims 1-3 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE520368 (KERB KONUS G M B H) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE8628212U (NOVAPLUS VERBINDUNGSELEMENTE GMBH) [A] 1,2 * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE8536615U (NADEL- UND DRAHTWARENFABRIK ERNST BIERBACH GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1,2 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * claims 1,5 * * figure 1 *; | [PA]WO9323677 (GUNNEBO FASTENING AB [SE], et al) [PA] 1,2 * claims 1-5 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE8233844U (STRAHL, GERHARD) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]FR1195076 (PITET, GABRIEL) |