EP0615947 - Filling machine for containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONES AG HERMANN KRONSEDER MASCHINENFABRIK Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 D-93073 Neutraubling / DE | [1994/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahlers, Egon Friedhofweg 23 D-93073 Neutraubling / DE | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94103701.2 | 10.03.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | DE19930003698U | 13.03.1993 Original published format: DE 9303698 U | [1994/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615947 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0615947 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/22, B67C3/00 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
B67C3/005 (EP);
B67C3/00 (KR);
B67C3/22 (EP);
B67C2003/2668 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/38] | Title | German: | Füllmaschine für Gefässe | [1994/38] | English: | Filling machine for containers | [1994/38] | French: | Machine de remplissage de récipients | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 02.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.06.1996 | [2002/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2499538 (SEITZ WERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10,14,16,18 * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 21; figures 1,2 * [Y] 11,12; | [Y]EP0408851 (ORTHMANN & HERBST [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE3927897 (ALFILL GETRAENKETECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE3224521 (SEITZ ENZINGER NOLL MASCH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * figure -; claims 1-5 *; | [A]DE3834874 (HOLSTEIN & KAPPERT MASCHF [DE]); | [A]DE2739742 (KRONSEDER HERMANN); | [A]DE3605482 (MARCHADOUR JEAN CHARLES [US]) |