EP0615722 - Cuff for blood pressure meter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 616-8025 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 10, Tsuchido-cho Hanazono Ukyo-ku Kyoto 616 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sano, Yoshihiko, c/o Omron Corporation Intell. Property Center, 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617 / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Toshiyuki, c/o Omron Corporation Intell. Property Center, 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617 / JP | 03 /
Teramoto, Tsutomu c/o Omron Corporation Intell. Property Center, 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617 / JP | 04 /
Fukumura, Kouta, c/o Omron Corporation Intell. Property Center, 20, Igadera, Shimokaiinji Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617 / JP | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94104014.9 | 15.03.1994 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | JP19930053638 | 15.03.1993 Original published format: JP 5363893 | JP19930286701 | 16.11.1993 Original published format: JP 28670193 | [1994/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615722 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0615722 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/022 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
A61B5/02241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/38] | Title | German: | Manchette für Blutdruckmesser | [1994/38] | English: | Cuff for blood pressure meter | [1994/38] | French: | Brassard pour l'appareil de mesure de la tension artérielle | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 10.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4331155 (SACKS ALVIN H) [A] 1,12 * column 3, line 65 - column 6, line 7 * * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 23; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2678040 (POOLE FORREST R, et al) [A] 1,12 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 25; figures 1-6 *; | [A]WO8300426 (IVAC CORP [US]) [A] 7,8 * abstract *;; figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE3612532 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 13, line 28 - page 15, line 29 * * page 19, line 35 - page 20, line 19; figures 1-3,8 *; | [A]US2452799 (SPEAKER DAVID M, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 53 - line 62; figure 3 * |