EP0626646 - File management method for interchangeable storage media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakashima, Kazuo, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Utsumi, Kenichi, c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1994/48] | Representative(s) | Seeger, Wolfgang Seeger & Seeger Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/48] | Seeger, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys. SEEGER & SEEGER Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94104111.3 | 16.03.1994 | [1994/48] | Priority number, date | JP19930122572 | 25.05.1993 Original published format: JP 12257293 | [1994/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626646 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626646 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02, G11B20/12 | [1994/48] | CPC: |
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G06F3/0601 (EP,US);
G06F3/0607 (EP,US);
G06F3/0643 (EP,US);
G06F3/0677 (EP,US);
G11B11/10597 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G06F2003/0697 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1259 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Dateiverwaltung von austauschbaren Datenträgern | [1994/48] | English: | File management method for interchangeable storage media | [1994/48] | French: | Procédé de gestion de fichiers de données des supports de données interchangeables | [1994/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.06.2002 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/47] | FR | 24.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0461668 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,3,5; | [Y]EP0487064 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,3,5; | [A]EP0528421 (SONY CORP [JP])[A] 1,3,5 |