EP0618111 - Belt tensioning device for a vehicle seat belt system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH Industriestrasse 20 73553 Alfdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH Industriestrasse 20 D-73553 Alfdorf / DE | ||
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states TRW REPA GMBH Industriestrasse 20 D-73551 Alfdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Betz, Hans-Peter Brombeerweg 8 D-73560 Böbingen / DE | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94104182.4 | 17.03.1994 | [1994/40] | Priority number, date | DE19930005086U | 02.04.1993 Original published format: DE 9305086 U | [1994/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0618111 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618111 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/18 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
B60R22/1952 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20462 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/40] | Title | German: | Gurtstraffer für ein Fahrzeugsicherheitsgurtsystem | [1994/40] | English: | Belt tensioning device for a vehicle seat belt system | [1994/40] | French: | Tendeur de ceinture pour système de ceinture de sécurité pour véhicule | [1994/40] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 28.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0450058 ; | [A]US4458921 (CHIBA MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 66 - column 4, line 12 *; | [A]US3239273 (PITNEY LENNORD L) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 66 *; | [DA]DE8900013U (R.SCHMIDT GMBH) [DA] 1 * figure . * * claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920602), vol. 16, no. 239, Database accession no. (M - 1258), & JP04050058 A 19920219 (TAKATA K.K.) [A] 1 * abstract * |