EP0617438 - An ignition coil and a method for the manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUSTRIE MAGNETI MARELLI S.p.A. Via Griziotti, 4 20145 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states INDUSTRIE MAGNETI MARELLI S.p.A. Via Griziotti, 4 I-20145 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leone, Alessandro Via Rosai 37 I-20038 Seregno (Milano) / IT | 02 /
Morini, Francesco Via Novaro 3 I-40141 Bologna / IT | [1994/39] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 94104250.9 | 18.03.1994 | [1994/39] | Priority number, date | IT1993TO00200 | 24.03.1993 Original published format: IT TO930200 | [1994/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617438 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01F31/00, H01F27/02 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
H01F27/022 (EP);
H01F38/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1994/39] | Title | German: | Zündspule und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1994/39] | English: | An ignition coil and a method for the manufacture thereof | [1994/39] | French: | Bobine d'allumage et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1994/39] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/52] | 08.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59195811 ; | [YA]EP0230811 (DUCELLIER & CIE [FR]) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 5; figures 1,5 * [A] 11,12,14,16; | [YA]DE9114575U (INDUSTRIE MAGNETI MARELLI) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,14,16,18 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850312), vol. 9, no. 56, Database accession no. (E - 302)<1779>, & JP59195811 A 19841107 (NIPPON DENSO) [A] 1,9,14,15 * abstract * |