EP0620631 - Management system for domestic electric loads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZELTRON S.p.A. Via Principe di Udine 114 I-33030 Campoformido Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/42] | For all designated states ZELTRON S.p.A. Via Principe di Udine 114 I-33030 Campoformido, Udine / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rugo, Anna Via Roma 20 I-33038 San Daniele Del Friuli, Udine / IT | 02 /
Diodato, Claudio Via Montova 86 I-33100 Udine / IT | [1996/49] |
Former [1994/42] | 01 /
Rugo, Anna Via Roma 20 F-33038 San Daniele Del Friuli, Udine / IT | ||
02 /
Diodato, Claudio Via Montova 86 I-33100 Udine / IT | Representative(s) | Busca, Luciano PROPRIA S.r.l. Via Mazzini 13 33170 Pordenone / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/42] | Busca, Luciano PROPRIA S.r.l. Via Mazzini 13 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | Application number, filing date | 94104383.8 | 21.03.1994 | [1994/42] | Priority number, date | IT1993PN00026 | 15.04.1993 Original published format: IT PN930026 | [1994/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0620631 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0620631 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/14, G05B19/04 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
G05B19/0421 (EP);
H02J13/00004 (EP);
H02J13/00019 (EP);
H02J3/14 (EP);
G05B2219/25187 (EP);
G05B2219/25192 (EP);
H02J2310/14 (EP);
Y02B70/30 (EP);
Y02B70/3225 (EP);
Y02B90/20 (EP);
Y04S20/00 (EP);
Y04S20/222 (EP);
Y04S20/242 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/42] | Title | German: | Kontrollsystem für elektrische Hausgeräte | [1994/42] | English: | Management system for domestic electric loads | [1994/42] | French: | Système de contrôle pour appareils électroménagers | [1994/42] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0099043 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 10, line 35 - page 18, line 5; figures 1,2 * [A] 2; | [A]EP0208597 (MANUF APPAREILLAGE ELECT [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 4, line 12 - page 12, line 22 ** page 14, line 4 - page 17, line 31; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0466152 (MOULINEX SA [FR]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 28 - column 5, line 45; figure 1 *; | [YA]FR2672400 (EURO CP SARL [FR]) [Y] 1 * page 5, line 24 - page 19, line 10; figures 1-9 * [A] 3 |