EP0621376 - Pneumatic road-cleaning vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUCHER-GUYER AG Maschinenfabrik CH-8166 Niederweningen / CH | [1994/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Öberg, Lennart Länsmansvägen 6 S-23030 Oxie / SE | [1994/43] | Application number, filing date | 94104391.1 | 21.03.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | CH19930001185 | 19.04.1993 Original published format: CH 118593 | [1994/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0621376 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621376 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E01H1/08 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
E01H1/0827 (EP);
E01H1/0863 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/43] | Title | German: | Strassenkehrmaschine mit einem Sauggebläse | [1994/43] | English: | Pneumatic road-cleaning vehicle | [1994/43] | French: | Balayeuse de rues avec ventilateur de circulation d'air | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 26.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3318756 (E. KERSCHNER) [X] 1-3,5 * page 14, paragraph 3 * * page 14, paragraph 5 - page 15, paragraph 2 * * page 16, paragraph 2 * * page 17, paragraph 4 - page 18, line 2; figure - * [Y] 8; | [XA]DE2908008 (KIBO) [X] 1-3,6 * page 6, paragraph 5; figure - * [A] 5; | [X]US4885817 (K. TANASE) [X] 1,2,9 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, line 35 - line 41; figure - *; | [XA]FR2340412 (FMC CORP.) [X] 1,2 * page 8, line 7 - line 22; figure - * [A] 5; | [X]DE4128879 (SCHÖRLING GMBH) [X] 1,9 * page 3, line 28 - line 30; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2824335 (A.W. MOFFAT) [Y] 8 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 3; figures 5,6 * |