EP0618562 - A display apparatus and a driving method for a display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asari, Goro, c/o Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakagawa, Yutaka, c/o Asahi Glass Company Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ruckmongathan, Temkar N. Raman Research Institute Sadashivanagar, Bangalore 560080 / IN | 04 /
Kuwata, Takeshi, c/o Asahi Glass Co Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho, 1150, Hazawa-cho Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94105066.8 | 30.03.1994 | [1994/40] | Priority number, date | JP19930095575 | 30.03.1993 Original published format: JP 9557593 | JP19930202926 | 23.07.1993 Original published format: JP 20292693 | [1994/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0618562 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618562 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
G09G3/3625 (EP,US);
G09G3/3611 (KR);
G09G3/3696 (KR);
G09G2310/0264 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/40] | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung und Steuerverfahren für Anzeigevorrichtung | [1994/40] | English: | A display apparatus and a driving method for a display apparatus | [1994/40] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage et méthode de commande pour dispositif d'affichage | [1994/40] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 18.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0507061 (IN FOCUS SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * page 24, line 48 - page 25, line 8 *; | [PA]EP0569974 (IN FOCUS SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PA] 1,6 * abstract * * page 2, line 32 - line 50 * * page 6, line 33 - page 17, line 12; figures 1-17 *; | [A]US5089812 (FUSE TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * column A * * column 2, line 34 - line 68 *; | [A]EP0319291 (EMI PLC THORN [GB]) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - line 54 * |