EP0619185 - Device for manufacturing a sleeve, particularly a sleeve-shaped printing plate with a gapless peripheral surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 D-63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Eduard, Dr. Lechallee 8b D-86399 Bobingen / DE | 02 /
Winterholler, Johann Friedberger Berg 6 D-86316 Friedberg / DE | 03 /
Prem, Wolfgang Bahnhofstrasse 10 D-86514 Ustersbach / DE | [1994/41] | Representative(s) | Schober, Stefan MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Postfach 10 00 96 86135 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Schober, Stefan MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG, Postfach 10 00 96 D-86135 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 94105131.0 | 31.03.1994 | [1994/41] | Priority number, date | DE19934311078 | 03.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4311078 | [1994/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0619185 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0619185 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/18 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
B41F27/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer Hülse, insbesondere einer hülsenförmigen Druckform, mit Zusammenhängender Umfangsfläche | [1994/41] | English: | Device for manufacturing a sleeve, particularly a sleeve-shaped printing plate with a gapless peripheral surface | [1994/41] | French: | Dispositif pour fabriquer un manchon, en particulier une plaque d'impression en forme de manchon à surface continue | [1994/41] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 30.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [APD]DE4140768 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]); | [A]JPS5874357 ; | [A]US3773594 (AARON C, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19580726), vol. 7, no. 169, Database accession no. (M - 231), & JP58074357 A 19830504 (DAINIPPON INSATSU KK) [A] * abstract * |