EP0621252 - Twolayer ionexchanger for bisphenol-A synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berg, Klaus, Dr. Hansastrasse 124 D-47798 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Malamet, Georg, Dr. Bethelstrasse 22 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Eitel, Alfred, Dr. Bahnhofstrasse 15 D-41539 Dormagen / DE | 04 /
Wulff, Claus, Dr. Richard-Strauss-Strasse 21 D-47800 Krefeld / DE | [1994/43] | Application number, filing date | 94105136.9 | 31.03.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | DE19934312039 | 13.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4312039 | [1994/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0621252 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621252 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/20, C07C39/16 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
C07C37/20 (EP,US);
B01J31/10 (EP,US);
B01J8/02 (EP,US);
B01J8/0453 (EP,US);
B01J2208/0007 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00088 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00495 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00548 (EP,US);
B01J2208/025 (EP,US);
B01J2231/347 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/20, C07C39/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, IT, NL [1994/43] | Title | German: | Ionenaustauscherschüttungen von zwei Schichten für die Bisphenol-A-Synthese | [1997/11] | English: | Twolayer ionexchanger for bisphenol-A synthesis | [1994/43] | French: | Echangeuses d'ions à deux couches pour la synthèse de bisphénol-A | [1994/43] |
Former [1994/43] | Ionenaustauscherschüttungen von zwei Schichte für die Bisphenol-A-Synthese | Examination procedure | 15.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH041149 ; | PL153148 [ ] (INSTYTUT CIEZKIEJ SYNTEZY ORGANICZNE); | JPH05317686 [ ] (TSUKISHIMA KIKAI CO); | [DA]US4400555 (MENDIRATTA ASHOK K [US]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 5; claim - * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 07, Database accession no. 92-053920, & JPH041149 A 19920106 (MITSUBISHI PETROCH) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - M KIEDIK ET AL, "EFFECT OF CROSSLINKING OF CATION EXCHANGERS ON THEIR CATALYTIC ACTIVITY IN THE CONDENSATION OF PHENOL WITH ACETONE", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930419), vol. 118, no. 16, Database accession no. 148084f, page 1, column 2 [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - PRZEM. CHEM., (1992), vol. 71, no. 9, pages 335 - 337 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920217), vol. 116, no. 7, Database accession no. 58942, page 818, column 1 [A] 1 * abstract * | [PX] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1994), vol. 120, Database accession no. 247789n, page 138, column 1 [PX] 1 * abstract * |