EP0619510 - Camera shutter with oscillation damping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fox, Myron Ellsworth, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1994/41] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Peter KODAK Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Schmidt, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. KODAK Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung D-70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94105218.5 | 02.04.1994 | [1994/41] | Priority number, date | US19930042434 | 05.04.1993 Original published format: US 42434 | [1994/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0619510 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0619510 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G03B9/22, G03B9/24 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
G03B9/24 (EP,US);
G03B9/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/41] | Title | German: | Optischer Kameraverschluss mit Schwingungsdämpfungsvorrichtung | [1994/41] | English: | Camera shutter with oscillation damping | [1994/41] | French: | L'obturateur d'une caméra ayant un dispositif pour l'amortissement de vibrations | [1994/41] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 18.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4218121 (NAKAGAWA YASUTSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,7* column 1, line 48 - column 4, line 52; figure 1 *; | [A]US4779114 (KOBAYASHI KIYOTAKA [JP]) [A] 1,4,7 * column 3, line 16 - column 6, line 18; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0377404 (MEFINA SA [CH]) [A] 1,2,4-7 * column 8, line 29 - column 9, line 43; figures 9,10 * | Examination | US5333024 |