EP0625354 - Medical preparation containing the subunit p40 of interleukin 12 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/30] |
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 D-35001 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seiler, Friedrich-Robert, Dr. Oberer Eichweg 10 D-35041 Marburg / DE | 02 /
Kurrle, Roland, Dr. Kiefernweg 12 D-35096 Niederweimar / DE | 03 /
Langner, Klaus-Dieter, Dr. Lindenweg 14 D-35041 Marburg / DE | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Hans-Jürgen, et al Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Industriepark Höchst Gebaüde K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Fischer, Hans-Jürgen, Dr., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 94105595.6 | 12.04.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | DE19934315127 | 07.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4315127 | [1994/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625354 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0625354 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00 | [2000/02] | CPC: |
C07K14/5434 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/47] | A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/47] | Title | German: | Arzneimittel enthaltend die Untereinheit p40 von Interleukin-12 | [1994/47] | English: | Medical preparation containing the subunit p40 of interleukin 12 | [1994/47] | French: | Préparation médicinale contenant l'unité subordonnée p40 de interleucine 12 | [1994/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 30.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA] - F.J. PODLASKI et al., "Molecular Characterization of Interleukin 12", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, (199204), vol. 294, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0003-9861(92)90162-P, pages 230 - 237, XP024761611 [DA] 1,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-9861(92)90162-P |