EP0627832 - Demodulator for RDS signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Robert-Bosch-Strasse 200 D-31139 Hildesheim / DE | [1994/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hegeler, Wilhelm Knollenstrasse 11 D-31134 Hildesheim / DE | [1994/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1994/51] |
Former [1994/49] | Eilers, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys. Blaupunkt-Werke GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 77 77 77 D-31132 Hildesheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 94105678.0 | 13.04.1994 | [1994/49] | Priority number, date | DE19934318641 | 04.06.1993 Original published format: DE 4318641 | [1994/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0627832 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627832 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/22, H04H1/00 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
H04H40/18 (EP,US);
H04L27/22 (KR);
H04L27/2332 (EP,US);
H04H20/34 (EP,US);
H04H2201/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [1994/49] | Title | German: | Demodulator für Radio-Daten-Signale | [1994/49] | English: | Demodulator for RDS signals | [1994/49] | French: | Démodulateur pour signaux "RDS" | [1994/49] | Examination procedure | 07.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0195989 (BLAUPUNKT WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 31 *; | [A]DE4029583 (HUBER FRANZ F DIPL ING FH [DE]) [A] 1* abstract * |