EP0621318 - Disperse dye composition and dyeing method employing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DyStar Textilfarben GmbH & Co. Deutschland KG Eschenheimer Tor 2 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1998/33] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states DyStar Japan Ltd. 7-20, Azuchimachi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states HOECHST MITSUBISHI KASEI CO., LTD. 10-33, Akasaka 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imafuku, Hideaki, c/o Hoechst Mitsubishi Kasei Co., Ltd, 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi Yahatanishi-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | 02 /
Fujita, Takashi, c/o Hoechst Mitsubishi Kasei Co., Ltd, 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi Yahatanishi-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | 03 /
Tamiya, Toshikazu, c/o Hoechst Mitsubishi Kasei Co., Ltd, 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi Yahatanishi-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | 04 /
Kira, Kuniko, c/o Hoechst Mitsubishi Kasei Co., Ltd, 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi Yahatanishi-ku, Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1998/33] |
Former [1998/11] | Muley, Ralf, Dr. DyStar Textilfarben GmbH & Co. Deutschland KG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Industriepark Höchst/Gebäude K801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1994/43] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94105718.4 | 13.04.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | JP19930115341 | 19.04.1993 Original published format: JP 11534193 | [1994/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0621318 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621318 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/00 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
C09B67/0041 (EP,US);
C09B67/0046 (EP,US);
Y10S8/922 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1994/43] | Title | German: | Dispersionsfarbstoffmischung sowie diese verwendendes Färbeverfahren | [1994/43] | English: | Disperse dye composition and dyeing method employing it | [1994/43] | French: | Mélange de colorants dispersants et procédé de coloration l'employant | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/06] | 27.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04173874 ; | [A]FR1291988 (SANDOZ SA) [A] 1-7 * page 1 *; | [A]DD229422 (BITTERFELD CHEMIE [DD]) [A] 1-7* page 3, line 2 - page 5, line 13 *; | [A]EP0164223 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 7 *; | [A]DE3537257 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * example 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921006), vol. 16, no. 479, Database accession no. (C - 992)<5522>, & JP04173874 A 19920622 (NIPPON KAYAKU CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |