EP0620550 - Optical head apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1994/42] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hineno, Satoshi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ando, Nobuhiko c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Tokyo / JP | [1994/42] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/42] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94105726.7 | 13.04.1994 | [1994/42] | Priority number, date | JP19930109883 | 13.04.1993 Original published format: JP 10988393 | JP19930120776 | 23.04.1993 Original published format: JP 12077693 | [1994/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0620550 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0620550 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0620550 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10, G11B7/135 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
G11B11/10545 (EP,US);
G11B7/1356 (EP,KR,US);
G11B11/105 (KR);
G11B11/10543 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/42] | Title | German: | Optische Kopfanordnung | [1994/42] | English: | Optical head apparatus | [1994/42] | French: | Dispositif de tête optique | [1994/42] | Examination procedure | 11.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/49] | 21.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98109380.0 / EP0859359 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0141679 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [A] 4; | [X]US4561032 (MATSUMOTO KAZUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column W *; | [XY]EP0264285 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8; | [A]US4951274 (IWANAGA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 7-11* column W *; | [A]EP0405444 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 7-10 * column 8; figure 10 * | [XY] - "Polarization splitting prism", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., NEW YORK US, (199006), vol. 33, no. 1A, pages 110 - 111 [X] 9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8 |