EP0615789 - Method for sorting bulk particles and device for that purpose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler AG 9240 Uzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states BÜHLER AG 9240 Uzwil / CH | ||
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states BÜHLER AG CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Massen, Robert, Dr. Prof. Kämpfenstrasse 39 D-78315 Radolfszell / DE | 02 /
Hegelbach, Hugo Weingarten CH-9572 Busswil / CH | 03 /
Zuber, Jürg Herrenhofstrasse 4b CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | 04 /
Tobler, Hans Stockenstrasse 12a CH-9249 Algetshausen / CH | 05 /
Schoenenberger, Niklaus Ramsen 2640 CH-9100 Herisau / CH | 06 /
Zapf, Helmut, Dr. Georg-Schwemann-Strasse 7 D-3205 Bockenem / DE | 07 /
Gemsjaeger, Helmut Köslinstrasse 41 D-38124 Braunschweig / DE | [1994/38] | Application number, filing date | 94105932.1 | 17.08.1991 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | DE19904029202 | 14.09.1990 Original published format: DE 4029202 | [1994/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0615789 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0615789 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | [1997/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0615789 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/342, B07C5/36 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
B07C5/36 (EP,US);
B07C5/3425 (EP,US);
B07C5/361 (EP,US);
B07C5/365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Sortieren von Partikeln eines Schüttgutes und Vorrichtung hierfür | [1994/38] | English: | Method for sorting bulk particles and device for that purpose | [1994/38] | French: | Procédé de tri de particules en vrac et dispositif à cet effet | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 09.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91113807.1 / EP0475121 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   06.10.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 13.06.2001 | NL | 13.06.2001 | LU | 17.08.2001 | BE | 31.08.2001 | DK | 13.09.2001 | SE | 13.09.2001 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | GR | 13.06.2001 | |
NL | 13.06.2001 | ||
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
DK | 13.09.2001 | ||
SE | 13.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | NL | 13.06.2001 | |
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
DK | 13.09.2001 | ||
SE | 13.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | NL | 13.06.2001 | |
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
SE | 13.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 13.09.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0219747 ; | [PX]EP0433498 (SATAKE ENG CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-7 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 36 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 7 * * column 6, line 18 - line 58 * * figures 1-5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900329), vol. 014, no. 162, Database accession no. (P - 1029), & JP02019747 A 19900123 (YANMAR AGRICULT EQUIP CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * |