EP0624904 - A multi-layer wiring board and a manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Hisashi, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/46] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106137.6 | 20.04.1994 | [1994/46] | Priority number, date | JP19930117954 | 21.04.1993 Original published format: JP 11795493 | [1994/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0624904 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0624904 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0624904 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/538, H01L21/48 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
H05K3/462 (EP,US);
H01L21/4857 (EP,US);
H01L23/5383 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15312 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K1/0313 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0195 (EP,US);
H05K3/28 (EP,US);
H05K3/4605 (EP,US);
H05K3/4623 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/46] | Title | German: | Mehrlagige Verdrahtungsplatine und ihre Herstellung | [1994/46] | English: | A multi-layer wiring board and a manufacturing method thereof | [1994/46] | French: | Circuit imprimé multicouche et procédé de fabrication associé | [1994/46] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 05.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4803595 (KRAUS CHARLES J [US], et al) [X] 1,4-9 * column 2, line 45 - line 60; figures 1,3 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]JPH03246993 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 2,3; | US5350886 [ ] (MIYAZAKI KUNIO [JP], et al) [ ] * column 3, line 41 - line 52 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0237808 (IBM [US]); | [PX]US5224265 (DUX JOHN B [US], et al) [PX] 2,3,5,7-9 * column W * | Examination | JPH0410696 | JPH05144973 | JPH04312998 | US5146674 | EP0543364 | EP0494668 | US3677112 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920417), vol. 016, no. 158, Database accession no. (E - 1191), & JP04010696 A 19920114 (NITTO DENKO CORP) | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930922), vol. 017, no. 528, Database accession no. (E - 1437), & JP05144973 A 19930611 (NEC CORP) | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930324), vol. 017, no. 148, Database accession no. (E - 1338), & JP04312998 A 19921104 (NEC CORP) |