EP0678773 - Silver bromoiodide core-shell grain emulsion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.2001 [2001/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tulalip Consultoria Comercial Sociedade Unipessoal S.A. Rua de Carreira 138 S. Pedro Funchal / PT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Tulalip Consultoria Comercial Sociedade Unipessoal S.A. Rua de Carreira 138 S. Pedro, Funchal / PT | ||
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mariotti, Mario 3M Italia Ricerche S.p.A. I-17016 Ferrania (Savona) / IT | 02 /
Barletta, Bruno 3M Italia Ricerche S.p.A. I-17016 Ferrania (Savona) / IT | 03 /
Besio, Mauro 3M Italia Ricerche S.p.A. I-17016 Ferrania (Savona) / IT | [1995/43] | Representative(s) | Allaix, Roberto Office of Intellectual Property Counsel 3M ITALIA S.p.A. Viale Martiri della Libertà, 57 17016 Ferrania (Savona) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | Allaix, Roberto Office of Intellectual Property Counsel 3M ITALIA S.p.A. Viale Martiri della Libertà, 57 I-17016 Ferrania (Savona) / IT | Application number, filing date | 94106187.1 | 21.04.1994 | [1995/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0678773 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0678773 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/035, G03C1/005, G03C7/30 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
G03C1/035 (EP,US);
G03C1/0051 (EP,US);
G03C1/005 (EP,US);
G03C1/16 (EP,US);
G03C1/18 (EP,US);
G03C2001/0055 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03535 (EP,US);
G03C2001/03558 (EP,US);
G03C2007/3025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/43] | Title | German: | Silberbromojodidemulsion aus Kern-Hülle-Körnern | [1995/43] | English: | Silver bromoiodide core-shell grain emulsion | [1995/43] | French: | Emulsion au bromoiodure d'argent comprenant des grains noyeau/enveloppe | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/24] | 04.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0299719 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [DX] 1-15 * claims 1-5,13,14 * * page 4, line 23 * * page 5, line 39 - line 41 *; | [X]EP0147854 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1,2 * * page 11, line 20 * * page 22, line 6 - page 27, line 13 *; | [D]US4668614 (TAKADA SHUNJI [JP], et al) | [DX] - H.HIRSCH, "Photographic Emulsion Grains with Cores", JOURNAL OF PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCE, LONDON GB, (1962), vol. 10, pages 129 - 146 [DX] 1 * part 2, fig.5 * |