EP0622383 - Graft polymers for treatment of flexible sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states RÖHM GMBH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Kirschenallee D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Harald, Dr. Am Sportplatz 8 D-64331 Weiterstadt / DE | 02 /
Christner, Jürgen, Dr. Tannenstrasse 7b D-64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 03 /
Weber, Maria Luise Im Taubhaus 7 D-63322 Rödermark / DE | 04 /
Höhne, Wolfgang, c/o Röhm Brasilera Caixa Postal 75, Roa Santo Agostino, 1099 93025-700 Sao Leopoldo / BR | [1994/44] | Application number, filing date | 94106268.9 | 22.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | DE19934313714 | 27.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4313714 | [1994/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622383 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622383 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08F265/06, C14C11/00, C09D151/00 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
C14C11/003 (EP,US);
C08F265/06 (EP,US);
C09D151/003 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F265/06, C08F2/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/44] | Title | German: | Pfropfpolymerisate zur Behandlung flexibler Flächengebilde | [1994/44] | English: | Graft polymers for treatment of flexible sheets | [1994/44] | French: | Copolymères greffés pour le traitement de feuilles souples | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 02.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0009258 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [Y] 2,3 * claim - * * example - *; | [XY]EP0082020 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1-3 * * example - * [Y] 2,3; | [A]EP0311908 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * example - * * claim 3 *; | [A]EP0387664 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * example - * * page 2, line 3 *; | [A]EP0492405 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claim - ** page 6, line 54 - page 7, line 10 * |