EP0622633 - Immunological detection of triazine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoess, Eva, Dr. Am Mühlberg 1A D-82319 Starnberg / DE | 02 /
Huber, Erasmus, Dr. St. Willibald 10 D-86923 Finning / DE | 03 /
Markert-Hahn, Christine, Dr. Herzogstandstrasse 2A D-82402 Seeshaupt / DE | 04 /
Rollinger, Wolfgang, Dr. Kaiser-Heinrich-Strasse 10 D-82398 Polling / DE | [1994/44] | Application number, filing date | 94106270.5 | 22.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | DE19934314091 | 29.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4314091 | [1994/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0622633 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0622633 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/94, // G01N33/535 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/5308 (EP,US);
Y10S436/815 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/44] | Title | German: | Immunologisches Nachweisverfahren für Triazine | [1994/44] | English: | Immunological detection of triazine | [1994/44] | French: | Détection immunologique de triazine | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 02.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/41] | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0365818 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0300381 (PFEIFFER BIOANALYTIK KG DR [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - S.J. HUBER ET AL., "a solid-phase enzyme immunoassay for quantitative determination of the herbicide terbutryn", ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR PFLANZENKRANKHEITEN UND PFLANZENSCHUTZ, STUTTGART DE, vol. 92, no. 2, pages 147 - 156 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - C. WITTMANN ET AL., "Development of an ELISA for the analysis of atrazine metabolites deethylatrazine and deisopropylatrazine", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, vol. 39, no. 6, pages 1194 - 1200 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - R.O. HARRISON ET AL., "Competitive inhibition ELISA for the s-triazine herbicides: assay optimization and antibody characterization.", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, vol. 39, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1021/jf00001a024, pages 122 - 128, XP055003598 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00001a024 | [Y] - C. WITTMANN ET AL., "ELISAs for the analysis of atrazine and atrazine metabolites in water.", VOM WASSER, WEINHEIM DE, vol. 75, pages 115 - 126 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [AD] - B. DUNBAR ET AL., "Development of enzyme immunoassay for the detection of triazine herbicides.", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, vol. 38, no. 2, pages 433 - 437 [AD] 1-4 * the whole document * |