EP0623910 - Information carrier to be clamped on a rod, in particular a garment rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johann Knupp GmbH & Co. Kronenstrasse 31-33 D-42697 Solingen / DE | [1994/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knoop, Heinz-Peter Balkhauser Kotten D-42659 Solingen / DE | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Grundmann, Dirk, Dr., et al Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 11 04 51 D-42304 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106386.9 | 25.04.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | DE19930006696U | 04.05.1993 Original published format: DE 9306696 U | [1994/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0623910 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0623910 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | [1996/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0623910 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/06, G09F3/16 | [1996/24] | CPC: |
G09F3/20 (EP,US);
G09F3/12 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44769 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44855 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44863 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/45] | G09F3/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/45] | Title | German: | Informationsträger zum Anklemmen auf Stangen, insbesondere Kleiderstangen | [1994/45] | English: | Information carrier to be clamped on a rod, in particular a garment rod | [1994/45] | French: | Support d'information destiné à être fixé sur des tringles, en particulier des tringles pour vêtements | [1994/45] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 08.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3041747 (GANTZ HELMUT DR) [DA] 1* figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0144675 (GRAFOPLAST SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * figures 1-8; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0295542 (GRAFOPLAST SPA [IT]) [A] 1,7,8 * column 2, line 16 - line 46; figures 1-13 *; | [X]WO8911153 (PARTEX FABRIKS AB [SE]) [X] 1,7,8,11 * page 3, line 16 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [XA]FR2638879 (LEGRAND SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,10,12 * page 5, line 14 - line 33; figures 4-6 * [A] 7,8; | [DA]EP0476303 (SCHLOESSER ULRICH [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * |