EP0622063 - Disposable absorbent articles and methods of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuen, David Arthur 1086 Honeysuckle Lane Neenah, WI, 54956 / JP | 02 /
Popp, Robert Lee 805 Giese Street Hortonville, WI, 54944 / JP | 03 /
Glaug, Frank Steven 37 Diane Lane Appleton, WI, 54915 / JP | 04 /
Luben, Julia Mae E11701 County C. Clintonville, WI 54929 / US | 05 /
Weber, Shirlee Ann 1576 Nelson Court Neeneh, WI 54956 / US | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/44] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Flüggenstrasse 13 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106510.4 | 26.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | US19930054508 | 26.04.1993 Original published format: US 54508 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0622063 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0622063 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
A61F13/49413 (EP,US);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A61F13/49014 (EP,US);
A61F13/495 (EP,US);
A61F13/496 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15357 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15365 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/44] | Title | German: | Absorbierendes Wegwerferzeugnis sowie Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1994/44] | English: | Disposable absorbent articles and methods of making same | [1994/44] | French: | Articles absorbants à jeter et procédé pour leur fabrication | [1994/44] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 22.11.1996 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/18] | 02.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4846825 (ENLOE KENNETH M [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [YD]US4940464 (VAN GOMPEL PAUL T [US], et al) [YD] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0386815 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0486006 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2680316 (PEAUDOUCE [FR]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [YP]WO9309739 (PEAUDOUCE [FR]) [YP] 1-23* the whole document * |