EP0623681 - Method for measuring sample by enzyme electrodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirose, Kazunori, c/o Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co. Ltd 57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1994/45] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106544.3 | 27.04.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | JP19930104104 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: JP 10410493 | [1994/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623681 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, G01N27/327 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
C12Q1/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung einer Probe mittels Enzymelektroden | [1994/45] | English: | Method for measuring sample by enzyme electrodes | [1994/45] | French: | Procédé de détermination d'un échantillon utilisant des électrodes à enzyme | [1994/45] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 19.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/48] | 07.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPS57179655 ; | [YA]DD207264 (FORSCHUNGSINST FUER MEDIZINISC [DD]) [Y] 4-11 * page 1, paragraph 1; example 1 * [A] 1,2; | [A]EP0407992 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,5-7,9 * column 1, line 48 - column 4, line 33; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4767994 (HOPKINS THOMAS R [US], et al) [A] 1,9-11 * column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 9; column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 44; figures 1,3,4; table I *; | [A]EP0286118 (NOVA BIOMEDICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1,9 * page 3, lines 5-29; page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 56; figures 1-3 * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830202), vol. 007, no. 026, Database accession no. (P - 172), & JP57179655 A 19821105 (FUJI DENKI SEIZO KK;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,3 [Y] 4-11 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 02, Database accession no. 83-02687 [ ] * abstract * |