EP0622244 - Recording medium, ink-jet recording method using the same, and dispersion of alumina hydrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshino, Hitoshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 02 /
Miura, Kyo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 03 /
Kondo, Yuji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/44] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106561.7 | 27.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | JP19930125437 | 28.04.1993 Original published format: JP 12543793 | JP19930125438 | 28.04.1993 Original published format: JP 12543893 | JP19930125439 | 28.04.1993 Original published format: JP 12543993 | JP19930352110 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 35211093 | JP19930352111 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 35211193 | JP19930352112 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 35211293 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622244 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622244 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41M1/30, C09D17/00, C01F7/02 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01F7/02 (EP,US);
C01F7/026 (EP,US);
C09D17/004 (EP,US);
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
C01P2002/02 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/04 (EP,US);
C01P2004/20 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/14 (EP,US);
C01P2006/16 (EP,US);
C01P2006/17 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US);
C01P2006/90 (EP,US);
D21H17/675 (EP,US);
D21H21/52 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/44] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmaterial, Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren, das dieses Material verwendet, und Aluminiumoxidhydratdispersion | [1994/44] | English: | Recording medium, ink-jet recording method using the same, and dispersion of alumina hydrate | [1994/44] | French: | Matériau d'enregistrement, méthode d'enregistrement l'utilisant, et dispersion d'hydrate d'alumine | [1994/44] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/31: (deleted) | EPB 1997/31: (deleted) | EPB 1997/31: (deleted) | EPB 1995/48: Teilanmeldung 95114387.4 eingereicht am 13/09/95 | EPB 1995/48: Divisional application 95114387.4 filed on 13/09/95 | EPB 1995/48: Demande divisionnaire 95114387.4 déposée le 13/09/95 | Examination procedure | 20.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95114386.6 / EP0698499 | EP95114387.4 / EP0691210 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.1998
ADMISSIBLE ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 1-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, TOKYO 100 / JP Opponent's representative Perrey, Ralf, et al, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.1998
ADMISSIBLE ASAHI GLASS COMPANY, LTD. 1-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, TOKYO 100 / JP Opponent's representative Perrey, Ralf, et al, et al Müller-Boré & Partner Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | 26.06.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.10.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.11.1998 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1999 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.03.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.04.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.07.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/02] | Appeal following opposition | 02.05.2002 | Appeal received No. T0507/02 | 28.08.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.07.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 27.07.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.08.2004 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]US4879166 (MISUDA KATSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [XD] 1-34 * column 2, line 24 - line 38; claims 1-5 *[AD] 35-43; | [XDA]EP0407720 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [XD] 1-34 * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 31; claims 1-8 * [AD] 35-43; | US5104730 [ ] (MISUDA KATSUTOSHI [JP], et al); | [XDA]EP0500021 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [XD] 1-34 * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 6 * * page 3, line 52 - page 4, line 13; examples 1-3; claims 1,3-7 * [AD] 35-43; | JPH04263981 [ ] (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) |