EP0622288 - Equipment for transferring containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/44] | Procedure for transferring of containers | ||
[1997/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bermüller, Wolfgang Regina-Ullmann-Strasse 36 D-81927 München / DE | [1994/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Säger, Manfred Säger & Hofmann Patent AG Feldgüetliweg 130 8706 Meilen (ZH) / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Säger, Manfred Säger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei (GbR) Römersteig 2 Postfach 5 7304 Maienfeld / CH | ||
Former [1994/44] | Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 505 CH-9004 St. Gallen / CH | Application number, filing date | 94106779.5 | 29.04.1994 | [1994/44] | Priority number, date | DE19934314373 | 30.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4314373 | [1994/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0622288 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0622288 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B61D47/00, B60P1/64 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
B60P1/6436 (EP);
B61D47/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/44] | Title | German: | Umsetzeinrichtung zum Umsetzen von Wechselbehältern | [1997/46] | English: | Equipment for transferring containers | [1997/46] | French: | Dispositif de transfert de conteneurs | [1997/46] |
Former [1994/44] | Verfahren zum Umsetzen von Wechselbehältern | ||
Former [1994/44] | Procedure for transferring of containers | ||
Former [1994/44] | Procédé pour transférer des conteneurs | Examination procedure | 13.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 20.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 12.11.1997 | FR | 12.11.1997 | GB | 12.11.1997 | IT | 12.11.1997 | NL | 12.11.1997 | SE | 12.02.1998 | LU | 29.04.1998 | BE | 30.04.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
GB | 12.11.1997 | ||
IT | 12.11.1997 | ||
NL | 12.11.1997 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
FR | 10.04.1998 | ||
LU | 29.04.1998 | ||
BE | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
GB | 12.11.1997 | ||
IT | 12.11.1997 | ||
NL | 12.11.1997 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
FR | 10.04.1998 | ||
BE | 30.04.1998 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
GB | 12.11.1997 | ||
IT | 12.11.1997 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
FR | 10.04.1998 | ||
BE | 30.04.1998 | ||
LU | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
GB | 12.11.1997 | ||
IT | 12.11.1997 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
FR | 10.04.1998 | ||
BE | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
GB | 12.11.1997 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
FR | 10.04.1998 | ||
BE | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
GB | 12.11.1997 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
FR | 10.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/41] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
GB | 12.11.1997 | ||
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | DK | 12.11.1997 | |
SE | 12.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | DK | 12.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1225559 (KLÖCKNER - HUMBOLDT - DEUTZ AG) [X] 1,2* column 4, line 1 - column 6, line 62; figures 1-16 *; | [X]US3357582 (LUDWIG WITTEK HANS) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 48; figures 1-3 *; | [X]CH629446 (LOEVGREN STEN [SE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * |