EP0623501 - Beam for vehicle frames [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BPW FAHRZEUGTECHNIK GmbH & CO. KG Pater-Ewald-Strasse 29 33104 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states BPW FAHRZEUGTECHNIK GmbH & CO. KG Pater-Ewald-Strasse 29 D-33104 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bröckling, Martin Pastor-Spieker-Weg 3 D-33161 Hövelhof / DE | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106798.5 | 30.04.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | DE19930006633U | 03.05.1993 Original published format: DE 9306633 U | [1994/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0623501 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0623501 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/00, B62D21/20 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
B62D21/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/45] | B62D21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/45] | Title | German: | Träger für Fahrzeugrahmen | [1994/45] | English: | Beam for vehicle frames | [1994/45] | French: | Poutre pour châssis de véhicules | [1994/45] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/06] | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1655841 (THEODOR WUPPERMANN GMBH) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE7146255U (FA. ALOIS KOBER KG) [A] 1 * page 3, line 10 - line 16 * * page 5, line 1 - line 6; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0479115 (AL-KO KOBER AG) [A] 1 * column 5, line 9 - column 8, line 5; figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]FR2474989 (MECANO-GALVA) [A] 1 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 31; figure 2 *; | [A]US3891231 (SNOBERGER ET AL.) [A] 1 * column 2, line 15 - column 4, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2136122 (ALMDALE) [A] 3 * column W *; | [A]FR364229 (MAUGIN) [A] 3 * the whole document *; | [A]US4640528 (BOYLES ET AL.); | [A]JPS57151467 ; | [A]DE9013693U (AL-KO KOBER AG); | [A]US4576398 (KINNIE) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821215), vol. 6, no. 256, Database accession no. (M - 179), & JP57151467 A 19820918 (KUREBAYASHI SUMIO ET AL.) [A] * abstract * |