EP0624354 - Orthodontic bracket with archwire slot liner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelly, John S., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Hansen, James D., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Caruso, Joseph M., Dr. 25044 Peachland Avenue, Suite 200 Newhall, California 91321 / US | [1994/46] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94106863.7 | 02.05.1994 | [1994/46] | Priority number, date | US19930061164 | 13.05.1993 Original published format: US 61164 | [1994/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0624354 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0624354 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0624354 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/12 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
A61C7/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/46] | Title | German: | Orthodontische Klammer mit Unterlage für den Korrekturbogen | [1994/46] | English: | Orthodontic bracket with archwire slot liner | [1994/46] | French: | Bracket orthodontique avec parte-guide pour fil d'acier | [1994/46] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 17.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4299569 (FRANTZ LEONARD) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 8 - line 14; figures 7-9 *; | [DA]US4302532 (WALLSHEIN MELVIN) [DA] 4,10,16* the whole document * |