EP0625430 - Method for protecting an image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge Massachusetts 02139-3589 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states POLAROID CORPORATION 549 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139-3589 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bloom, Iris B.K. 78 Mallard Way Waltham, MA 02154 / US | 02 /
Gaudiana, Russell A. 71 Turkey Hill Road Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | 03 /
Schild, Howard G. 96 Colborne Road Brighton, MA 02135 / US | 04 /
Fehervari, Agota F. 580 Concord Avenue Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 05 /
Minns, Richard A. 64 Claremont Avenue Arlington, MA 02174 / US | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94107010.4 | 04.05.1994 | [1994/47] | Priority number, date | US19930065345 | 20.05.1993 Original published format: US 65345 | [1994/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625430 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0625430 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/02 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
B41M7/0027 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/239 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24851 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24868 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/47] | Title | German: | Bildschutzverfahren | [1994/47] | English: | Method for protecting an image | [1994/47] | French: | Méthode pour protéger une image | [1994/47] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 28.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO9209930 (POLAROID CORP [US]) [XD] 1-5,9-15 * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 20; figure 2; examples 6,10 * * page 10, line 5 - page 11, line 2 * * page 12, line 14 - page 14, line 9 *; | [A]EP0520300 (DIAFOIL HOECHST CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, line 7 - line 10 * * page 5, line 29 - line 35 *; | [A]EP0495482 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 21; figures 1A,1B; claims 1-3 * |