EP0623567 - Process for preparing microporous bodies with thermal insulating properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stohr, Günter, Dr. Stuibenstrasse 14 D-87471 Durach / DE | 02 /
Eyhorn, Thomas Walzlings 6 D-87452 Altusried / DE | 03 /
Kratel, Günter, Dr. Alpenblickstrasse 10 D-87471 Durach / DE | [1994/45] | Application number, filing date | 94107047.6 | 05.05.1994 | [1994/45] | Priority number, date | DE19934315088 | 06.05.1993 Original published format: DE 4315088 | [1994/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623567 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0623567 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C04B30/00, C04B38/06, F16L59/04, // (C04B30/00, 14:06, 14:26, 14:30) | [1994/45] | CPC: |
C04B38/06 (EP,US);
C04B30/00 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00612 (EP,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B30/00, C04B14/062, C04B14/26, C04B14/303, C04B14/386, C04B38/06, C04B40/0263, C04B2103/56 (US,EP);
C04B30/00, C04B14/062, C04B14/303, C04B14/304, C04B38/065, C04B40/0268, C04B2103/56 (EP,US);
C04B30/00, C04B14/062, C04B14/303, C04B14/304, C04B38/0675, C04B40/0268, C04B2103/56 (EP,US);
C04B30/00, C04B14/062, C04B14/303, C04B14/304, C04B38/068, C04B40/0268, C04B2103/56 (EP,US);
C04B30/00, C04B14/062, C04B14/303, C04B18/24, C04B22/06, C04B38/06, C04B40/0263, C04B2103/56 (US,EP);
C04B30/00, C04B14/303, C04B16/06, C04B22/06, C04B38/06, C04B40/0263, C04B2103/56 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines mikroporösen Körpers mit wärmedämmenden Eigenschaften | [1994/45] | English: | Process for preparing microporous bodies with thermal insulating properties | [1994/45] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de corps microporeux à caractéristiques calorifuges | [1994/45] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 05.05.1994 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR488308 (LOUIS PELOT [DZ]) [A] 1,2,5 * page 1 *; | [AD]EP0027633 (GRUENZWEIG HARTMANN GLASFASER [DE]) [AD] 1,4,5 * claim - *; | [A]DE3713526 (GRUENZWEIG HARTMANN GLASFASER [DE]) [A] 1,2,5* claim 1 * |